U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Running Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2023: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 08, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 20, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Request]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 19, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.