U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Waiver]
  • February 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Request]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2019: [Arrest]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 28, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2019: [Request]
  • June 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.