open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:19-10051
    Party Name:Joshua David Bastian
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
    Date Published:September 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?53778
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =