U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grass
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 03, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Furlough]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 09, 2019: [Request]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arrest]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 12, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 12, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.