open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:19-10053
    Party Name:Jason Wayne Pouncy
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auditors Report]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Selected for Audit]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?53781
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =