U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ernesti et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • September 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 04, 2020: [Response]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 02, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 24, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • August 13, 2020: [Admission]
  • August 13, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 07, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2020: [Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 26, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 21, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 21, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 22, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • October 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 25, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 18, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Response]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • July 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Request]
  • June 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 18, 2019: [Request]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Request]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • June 14, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 13, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.