U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Houtsma
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 27, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 23, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 03, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 27, 2021: [Response]
  • August 26, 2021: [Furlough]
  • August 26, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 27, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Response]
  • July 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2019: [Request]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.