U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yang
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 17, 2020: [Forfeiture]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 10, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • August 10, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • August 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 11, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Request]
  • February 12, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 28, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 26, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • June 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.