U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bettelyoun
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 30, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 19, 2022: [Furlough]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Waiver]
  • December 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 12, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 11, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 09, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 28, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • May 27, 2020: [Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 27, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 27, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 21, 2019: [Response]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 20, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 05, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Request]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (deactivated)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.