U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Boy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 10, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Request]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arrest]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.