U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • March 09, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • March 02, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 01, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 01, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 16, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • February 09, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 26, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 26, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 14, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 14, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 05, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 04, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extend]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 29, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 25, 2021: [Evaluation]
  • August 23, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 23, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 23, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 23, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 25, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 19, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Request]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 05, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2019: [Arrest]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.