U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Apple
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Certificate]
  • June 17, 2020: [Response]
  • June 17, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 16, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 11, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 08, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 20, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 13, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 08, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.