U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40047-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Swanson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Response]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • May 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 19, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 04, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • March 03, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 31, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 25, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • July 22, 2020: [Reduce Sentence]
  • July 21, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2020: [Certificate]
  • May 21, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 24, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 17, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 03, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2019: [Certificate]
  • August 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • August 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 16, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2019: [Response]
  • July 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2019: [Request]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • June 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 19, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.