U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Mountain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 08, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Vacate (Not 28:2255)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Request]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 03, 2021: [Discovery]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 14, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • May 01, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Request]
  • April 09, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 12, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 12, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • March 11, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 10, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 24, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 21, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 21, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 21, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 03, 2020: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 27, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 27, 2020: [New Trial]
  • January 24, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2020: [Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 14, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 13, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Response]
  • November 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 17, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 20, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • September 17, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 17, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 06, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Verdict]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 06, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 06, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 06, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • September 05, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • September 05, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 05, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 03, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 03, 2019: [Jury List]
  • September 02, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 01, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
August, 2019
  • August 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 30, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 29, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 29, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 26, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 26, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 26, 2019: [Response]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 22, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 20, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 20, 2019: [Delivered]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 20, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 20, 2019: [Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Request]
  • June 19, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.