U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-01003
  • Case Name: Snyder v. Seaboy-Block
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 08, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 23, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • July 22, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • June 19, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 19, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.