U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50112
  • Case Name: Jeremy Dean Butcher and Courtney Irene Rans
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.