U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vallette et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 14, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extend]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2022: [Consent]
  • April 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 05, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 31, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 04, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 04, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Bail Report]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • January 12, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 30, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Request]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 05, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 20, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 20, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.