U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30014
  • Case Name: Levi Edward Garrett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
July, 2019
  • July 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.