U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10056
  • Case Name: Jason Wayne Palmer and Jill Anna Palmer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (deactivated)]
September, 2021
  • September 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (deactivated)]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (deactivated)]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.