U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:03-cr-40017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 27, 2020: [Consent]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 25, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 26, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 08, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 03, 2019: [Response]
  • July 03, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 03, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • July 03, 2019: [Seal Existing Document]
  • July 03, 2019: [Request]
  • July 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 01, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.