U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • April 17, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 21, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 15, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 02, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 01, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.