U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 17, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 11, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 09, 2021: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 02, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 02, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 26, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 19, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2021: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 11, 2020: [Extend]
  • November 11, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 02, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Extend]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 14, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 11, 2019: [Request]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 01, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.