U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dillon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2020: [Certificate]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 22, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 08, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 08, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.