U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10019-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bertino et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 11, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 13, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 31, 2020: [Extend]
  • December 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 06, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 05, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 04, 2020: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2020: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • November 01, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 01, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 01, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • November 01, 2020: [Order re Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 29, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 29, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 29, 2020: [Verdict]
  • October 29, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 26, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 26, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 26, 2020: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • October 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [Response]
  • October 23, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 23, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 22, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 22, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 20, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 15, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 15, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 14, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice]
  • October 13, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 13, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 12, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 09, 2020: [Request]
  • October 08, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2020: [Quash]
  • October 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 08, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response]
  • July 02, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • June 01, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 22, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 22, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 21, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 20, 2020: [Response]
  • May 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2020: [Change Venue]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2019: [Request]
  • July 11, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 10, 2019: [Request]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 08, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.