U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brings Plenty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Evaluation]
  • July 26, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 26, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extend]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • December 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 08, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 13, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 10, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.