U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-50086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clifford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 10, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 09, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.