U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Enescu et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 29, 2021: [Forfeiture]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 15, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • March 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 03, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 03, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
  • February 12, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2021: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 11, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 07, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 05, 2021: [Quash]
  • January 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • December 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [Joinder]
  • December 22, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [For Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 13, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • November 10, 2020: [In Limine]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 22, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 21, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 21, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 02, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 03, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Response]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Request]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 17, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 01, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [In Limine]
  • June 30, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 10, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 13, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2020: [In Limine]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Consent to Forfeiture]
  • February 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 19, 2020: [In Limine]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 03, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 07, 2019: [Response]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 31, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Response]
  • July 31, 2019: [Request]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.