U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 27, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Response]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Request]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 10, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • July 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.