U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crowe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Request]
  • July 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.