U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ottmo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2021: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 29, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Request]
  • October 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2019: [Arrest]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.