U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swallow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Response]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 24, 2021: [Furlough]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 21, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Release from Custody]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 25, 2020: [Furlough]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 17, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 20, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Request]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 10, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.