U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hein
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 25, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • January 25, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 06, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • June 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Request]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • July 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.