open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04121
    Party Name:United States of America v. Pottebaum et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?66693
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =