U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50126
  • Case Name: Louis Charles Ewing
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale (Text Entry)]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reminder to File a Document]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • September 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Creditor List]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.