open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04122
    Party Name:O'Meara Hernes v. Intex Recreation Corp.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26 Disclosures]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Form 52 Report]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Discovery Report]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?66694
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =