U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawk et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 11, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 05, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2020: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • June 09, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • June 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 09, 2020: [Response]
  • April 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 08, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 12, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2020: [Consent]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 05, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 31, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 17, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 19, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 09, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 09, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 09, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 06, 2019: [Consent]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 23, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 22, 2019: [Request]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2019: [Request]
  • July 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2019: [Request]
  • July 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.