open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:19-cv-05047
    Party Name:Wiseley v. Stevens
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Letter - 1983 Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?66695
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =