U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Durrani et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 29, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 29, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2020: [Extend]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Extend]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Response]
  • July 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Request]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 11, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.