U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-01004
  • Case Name: Huffman et al v. Brenner et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Certified Copy]
  • March 31, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 02, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • January 23, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 08, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.