U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Legs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Mail Returned]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Extend]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 21, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • February 19, 2021: [Redact Transcript]
  • February 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 01, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • January 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 15, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 11, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 11, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 11, 2021: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 01, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 20, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2020: [Furlough]
  • August 13, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 11, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • August 11, 2020: [Text Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 11, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 31, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 31, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 31, 2020: [Verdict]
  • July 31, 2020: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • July 31, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 30, 2020: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • July 30, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 28, 2020: [Jury List]
  • July 28, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 28, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 28, 2020: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • July 28, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 27, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 27, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 27, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 27, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 24, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 24, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 20, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • July 14, 2020: [Jury List]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Hearing]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2020: [Objection]
  • April 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 14, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 22, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 16, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 16, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 12, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 12, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Request]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.