U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schroeder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 28, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • May 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [For Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 23, 2020: [Evaluation]
  • March 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 02, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 12, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 17, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2019: [Request]
  • July 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 16, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.