U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hedrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 26, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • July 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 13, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 07, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • May 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 30, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 30, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 26, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Waiver]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 31, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 31, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Response]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 08, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Suppress]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Waiver]
  • September 10, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 16, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.