U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50128
  • Case Name: Rex Daniel Gortmaker, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
  • April 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 14, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Amendment]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule C]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule A/B]
October, 2019
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.