U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fast Dog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Furlough]
  • January 31, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 20, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 05, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 28, 2019: [Furlough]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Request]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.