U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rojas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 21, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 14, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 06, 2019: [Request]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Request]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 23, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.