U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dillon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Consent]
  • April 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2022: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2022: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extend]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Bail Report]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 16, 2021: [Request]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2021: [Request]
  • November 12, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.