U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 05, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 29, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 29, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 04, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 07, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 31, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 31, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 31, 2020: [Request]
  • January 31, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order for Warrant]
  • December 09, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 26, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2019: [Arrest]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Request]
  • August 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.