U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hanson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Forfeiture]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 06, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 14, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 08, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Request]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.