U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 25, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 24, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • August 04, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 03, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 21, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • May 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 05, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Request]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 18, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.