U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 24, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • September 04, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 04, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 03, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 03, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2019: [Consent]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 19, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 19, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 19, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Request]
  • July 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.